PA HB1985 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications.
Title
In wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1985 PN 2384, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02828 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1985 PN 2384, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02828 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-12-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-14 | House | Second consideration |
2021-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |