PA HB1982 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, credited service, classes of service, and eligibility for benefits, further providing for credited State service; in contributions, further providing for shared-risk member contributions and shared-gain adjustments to regular member contributions, for contributions to the system by the Commonwealth and other employers and for actuarial cost method and providing for advance payment of accrued liability contributions; in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board, for duties of heads of departments and for State accumulation account; providing for obligations of the board, for exercise of legislative power and for liability.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, credited service, classes of service, and eligibility for benefits, further providing for credited State service; in contributions, further providing for shared-risk member contributions and shared-gain adjustments to regular member contributions, for contributions to the system by the Commonwealth and other employers and for actuarial cost method and providing for advance payment of accrued liability contributions; in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board, for duties of heads of departments and for State accumulation account; providing for obligations of the board, for exercise of legislative power and for liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1982 PN 2895, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1982 PN 2895, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1982 PN 2787, 2019 A3644, GROVE (Y: 108 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1982 PN 2895, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1982 PN 2787, 2019 A3644, GROVE (Y: 108 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Act No. 105 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-11-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-11-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-11-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-10-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |