PA HB1982 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, credited service, classes of service, and eligibility for benefits, further providing for credited State service; in contributions, further providing for shared-risk member contributions and shared-gain adjustments to regular member contributions, for contributions to the system by the Commonwealth and other employers and for actuarial cost method and providing for advance payment of accrued liability contributions; in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board, for duties of heads of departments and for State accumulation account; providing for obligations of the board, for exercise of legislative power and for liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, credited service, classes of service, and eligibility for benefits, further providing for credited State service; in contributions, further providing for shared-risk member contributions and shared-gain adjustments to regular member contributions, for contributions to the system by the Commonwealth and other employers and for actuarial cost method and providing for advance payment of accrued liability contributions; in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board, for duties of heads of departments and for State accumulation account; providing for obligations of the board, for exercise of legislative power and for liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1982 PN 2895, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1982 PN 2895, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1982 PN 2787, 2019 A3644, GROVE (Y: 108 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-27SenateAct No. 105
2019-11-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-11-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-11-21SenateSigned in Senate
2019-11-21SenateSigned in House
2019-11-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-11-20SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-20SenateSecond consideration
2019-11-19SenateFirst consideration
2019-11-19SenateReported as committed
2019-11-19SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-11-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-11-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-18HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-10-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-30HouseReported as committed
2019-10-25HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1982
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1982&pn=2787
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1982&pn=2895
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=1307
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=832
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=856
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1408
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=662
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/20/2019&RollCallId=683
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=367

Bill Comments

feedback