PA HB1981 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 37 (Historical and Museums) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission; in powers and duties of Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission, providing for volunteer program; and making related repeals.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission; in powers and duties of Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission, providing for volunteer program; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1981 PN 2786, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1981 PN 2786, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-15 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |