PA HB1981 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.

Sponsors

Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D]Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]Rep. Curtis Thomas [D]Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]
Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Rosita Youngblood [D]Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Kevin Haggerty [D]
Rep. Dominic Costa [D]Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Anita Kulik [D]
Rep. Vanessa Brown [D]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Daniel Deasy [D]
Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D]Rep. Todd Stephens [R]Rep. Michael Sturla [D]Rep. Alexander Charlton [R]
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Timothy Briggs [D]Rep. Jared Solomon [D]Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D]
Rep. David Maloney [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Eric Roe [R]Rep. Perry Warren [D]
Rep. Rebecca Corbin [R]Rep. Marguerite Quinn [R]Rep. Mark Rozzi [D]Rep. Susan Helm [R]
Rep. Thomas Quigley [R]Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Adam Ravenstahl [D]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]
Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]Rep. Katharine Watson [R]Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]
Rep. Jim Cox [R]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Jonathan Fritz [R]Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D]
Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. Michael Hanna [D]Rep. David Hickernell [R]
Rep. James Santora [R]Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]
Rep. Justin Walsh [R]Rep. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R]Rep. Dan Frankel [D]Rep. Donna Bullock [D]
Rep. Austin Davis [D]Rep. Kevin Boyle [D]Rep. Scott Conklin [D]Rep. Florindo Fabrizio [D]
Rep. Patrick Harkins [D]Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]Rep. Richard Saccone [R]Rep. Gene DiGirolamo [R]
Rep. Zachary Mako [R]Rep. Marcia Hahn [R]Rep. Frank Farry [R]Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]

Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06328 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06278 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06318 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-13HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-11HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-11HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-11HouseReported as amended
2018-03-08HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1981
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1981&pn=3084
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1981&pn=3323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/11/2018&RollCallId=1391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/11/2018&RollCallId=1395
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/11/2018&RollCallId=1396
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/11/2018&RollCallId=1397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=04/11/2018&RollCallId=1392

Bill Comments

feedback