PA HB1974 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in crime victims, further providing for rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In crime victims, further providing for rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1974 PN 2830, FP (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-02-06SenateIn the Senate
2018-02-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-1)
2018-02-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-02-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-02-05HouseSecond consideration
2018-01-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseFirst consideration
2018-01-23HouseReported as committed
2017-12-19HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback