PA HB1970 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 15, 1874 (P.L.186, No.120), entitled "An act declaring what offices are incompatible," further providing for offices of member of Congress and State Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of May 15, 1874 (P.L.186, No.120), entitled "An act declaring what offices are incompatible," further providing for offices of member of Congress and State Legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06971 (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House State Government: Postpone vote on HB1970 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-01HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-01HouseReported as amended
2017-12-19HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1970
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1970&pn=2827
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1970&pn=3473
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1480
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1477
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1478

Bill Comments

feedback