PA HB1964 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of State Route 115 in Monroe County as the Submarine Veterans Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of State Route 115 in Monroe County as the Submarine Veterans Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1964 PN 2813, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateLaid on the table
2018-04-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-25SenateReported as committed
2018-03-16SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-03-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-12HouseSecond consideration
2018-02-06HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseFirst consideration
2018-01-23HouseReported as committed
2017-12-12HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1964
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1964&pn=2813
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1218
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1027
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1335
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=04/25/2018&RollCallId=822

Bill Comments

feedback