PA HB1963 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in membership, contributions and benefits, further providing for actuarial cost method; and, in contributions, further providing for actuarial cost method.
Title
In membership, contributions and benefits, further providing for actuarial cost method; and, in contributions, further providing for actuarial cost method.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1963 PN 2705, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-09-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-28 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |