PA HB1960 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for regulatory compliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for regulatory compliance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1960 PN 3463, FP (Y: 116 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1960 PN 2861, 2017 A6667, DALEY (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1960 PN 2861, 2017 A6665, DALEY (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05703 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateReferred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
2018-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-72)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2018-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2018-02-06HouseReported as committed
2018-01-05HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1960
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1960&pn=2861
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1960&pn=3463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/06/2018&RollCallId=1252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/06/2018&RollCallId=1253
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1160
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1161
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1500
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1226

Bill Comments

feedback