PA HB196 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in military leave of absence, further providing for employment discrimination for military membership or duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In military leave of absence, further providing for employment discrimination for military membership or duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 196 PN 162, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 162, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateAct No. 31
2021-06-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-25SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-24SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-24SenateSigned in House
2021-06-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-06-22SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-21SenateReported as committed
2021-03-18SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-03-17SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-03-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-16HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-03HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-03HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-03HouseReported as committed
2021-01-21HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=196
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0196&pn=0162
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0196P0162.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=02/03/2021&RollCallId=65
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=02/03/2021&RollCallId=66
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=73
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=176
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/21/2021&RollCallId=356
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=198

Bill Comments

feedback