PA HB1956 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on September 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, extensively revising the Uniform Arbitration Act; and making editorial changes.
Title
Extensively revising the Uniform Arbitration Act; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Cutler [R] | Rep. Craig Dally [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Glen Grell [R] |
Rep. Ron Miller [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R] | Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] |
Rep. Curtis Sonney [R] | Rep. Will Tallman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-13 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-24 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-24 | First consideration | |
2010-06-24 | Reported as amended | |
2009-09-01 | Referred to JUDICIARY |