PA HB1953 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the membership of the advisory committee of The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund.
Title
Further providing for the membership of the advisory committee of The Governor Robert P. Casey Memorial Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - HB 1953 PN 2618, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE | |
2010-03-10 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-09 | Second consideration | |
2010-03-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-01-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-01-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-01-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-25 | First consideration | |
2010-01-25 | Reported as committed | |
2009-08-31 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |