PA HB1952 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 37 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 37 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in United States Semiquincentennial, providing for infrastructure improvements and projects.
Title
In United States Semiquincentennial, providing for infrastructure improvements and projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1952 PN 3164, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1952 PN 3164, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04211 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1952 PN 3164, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A04211 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 37 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-3) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-10-04 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |