PA HB1951 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-14)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, in public assistance, prohibiting eligibility for Megan's Law violators.
Title
In public assistance, prohibiting eligibility for Megan's Law violators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2014-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-01-29 | House | Second consideration |
2014-01-28 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-27 | House | First consideration |
2014-01-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to HEALTH |