PA HB1951 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-18)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on November 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-09-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act providing for the elimination of property tax for older Pennsylvanians, for a one-year cap on real property tax increases for school property tax purposes and for the elimination of authority to levy real property taxes for the support of public schools; imposing additional duties on the Department of Education; providing for the transfer of certain funds; and making related repeals.
Title
An Act providing for the elimination of property tax for older Pennsylvanians, for a one-year cap on real property tax increases for school property tax purposes and for the elimination of authority to levy real property taxes for the support of public schools; imposing additional duties on the Department of Education; providing for the transfer of certain funds; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-15 | Removed from table | |
2008-09-15 | Laid on the table | |
2008-09-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-07-03 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2008-07-03 | First consideration | |
2008-07-03 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill dropped from calendar | |
2008-07-03 | Reported as amended | |
2008-06-30 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented | |
2007-11-07 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1951 |