PA HB1947 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preemptions, providing for restrictions on utility services prohibited.
Title
In preemptions, providing for restrictions on utility services prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, FP (Y: 118 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, 2021 A2795 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, 2021 A2782 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, 2021 A2781 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02727 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, FP (Y: 118 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, 2021 A2795 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, 2021 A2782 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2223, 2021 A2781 (Y: 85 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02727 (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (118-83) |
2022-01-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-12-14 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-10-04 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |