PA HB1947 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in limitation of time, further providing for infancy, insanity or imprisonment, for no limitation applicable and for other offenses; and, in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity and for exceptions to governmental immunity.
Title
In limitation of time, further providing for infancy, insanity or imprisonment, for no limitation applicable and for other offenses; and, in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity and for exceptions to governmental immunity.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Marsico [R] | Rep. Joseph Petrarca [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Timothy Briggs [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Miccarelli [R] | Rep. Margo Davidson [D] | Rep. Thomas Murt [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1947 PN 3667, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3163, FP (Y: 180 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3163, MOT POSTPONE, DIAMOND (Y: 11 N: 186 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3085, 2015 A6679, SUSP RULES, JOZWIAK (Y: 87 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3085, 2015 A6694, ROZZI (Y: 166 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06462 (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06458 (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3163, FP (Y: 180 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3163, MOT POSTPONE, DIAMOND (Y: 11 N: 186 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3085, 2015 A6679, SUSP RULES, JOZWIAK (Y: 87 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 3085, 2015 A6694, ROZZI (Y: 166 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06462 (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06458 (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-06-30 | House | In the House |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3667 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-04-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (180-15) |
2016-04-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-05 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |