PA HB1944 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly and for transmission of budget information to the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for submission of budget to General Assembly and for transmission of budget information to the General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1944 PN 2807, FP (Y: 116 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1944 PN 2782, 2017 A5075, DALEY (Y: 69 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1944 PN 2782, 2017 A5113, GROVE (Y: 120 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04989 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-20SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-76)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-12-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as amended
2017-12-01HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1944
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1944&pn=2767
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1944&pn=2782
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1944&pn=2807
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1121
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=917
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=918
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=937
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1177

Bill Comments

feedback