PA HB1943 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for definitions and further providing for budget implementation data, for electronic access of information and for lapsing of funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth budget procedures, providing for definitions and further providing for budget implementation data, for electronic access of information and for lapsing of funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1943 PN 2806, FP (Y: 116 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1943 PN 2766, 2017 A5111, GROVE (Y: 120 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-20SenateReferred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-76)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-12-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as committed
2017-12-01HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1943
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1943&pn=2766
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1943&pn=2806
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1119
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=916
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=936
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1176

Bill Comments

feedback