PA HB1940 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Third consideration and final passage (116-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for revenue estimates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth budget procedures, further providing for revenue estimates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1940 PN 2779, FP (Y: 116 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5147, DEAN (Y: 34 N: 154 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5105, KRUEGER-BRANEKY (Y: 50 N: 139 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5102, KINSEY (Y: 72 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5083, HANNA (Y: 74 N: 115 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04968 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-76)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as amended
2017-12-01HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1940
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1940&pn=2763
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1940&pn=2779
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1113
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=910
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=911
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=912
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=913
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=926
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1173

Bill Comments

feedback