PA HB1936 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to size, weight and load, further providing for restrictions on use of highways and bridges; and, in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for operation by persons under age sixteen and for mufflers and sound controls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions relating to size, weight and load, further providing for restrictions on use of highways and bridges; and, in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for operation by persons under age sixteen and for mufflers and sound controls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1936 PN 4275, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1936 PN 4275, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1936 PN 2753, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (180-0)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-17HouseIn the House
2018-10-17SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-16SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-10-02SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-02SenateSecond consideration
2018-09-26SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-26SenateReported as committed
2018-01-02SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-12-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-11HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as committed
2017-11-27HouseReferred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1936
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1936&pn=2753
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1936&pn=4275
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1098
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=941
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1172
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=09/26/2018&RollCallId=1134
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1207
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1629
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=739

Bill Comments

feedback