PA HB1934 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of West Chester University of Pennsylvania of the State System of Higher Education and the Governor, to grant and convey to Aqua Pennsylvania, Inc., or its assigns, an existing water tower and permanent utility easement from lands of the Commonwealth at West Chester University of Pennsylvania, situate in the Borough of West Chester, Chester County, for the purpose of public water distribution.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of West Chester University of Pennsylvania of the State System of Higher Education and the Governor, to grant and convey to Aqua Pennsylvania, Inc., or its assigns, an existing water tower and permanent utility easement from lands of the Commonwealth at West Chester University of Pennsylvania, situate in the Borough of West Chester, Chester County, for the purpose of public water distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1934 PN 3076, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1934 PN 3076, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1934 PN 3076, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Act No. 63 |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2016-05-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2016-05-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-16 | House | Second consideration |
2016-05-03 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |