PA HB1933 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act prohibiting certain benefit packages for children's health care and medical assistance to include gender or sex reassignment surgery or gender or sex transition services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting certain benefit packages for children's health care and medical assistance to include gender or sex reassignment surgery or gender or sex transition services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04817 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-06HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-14HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-27HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-20HouseReported as amended
2017-11-20HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback