PA HB1931 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusion, providing for arrest or removal of persons from residential property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In burglary and other criminal intrusion, providing for arrest or removal of persons from residential property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1931 PN 3664, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07451 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02SenateFirst consideration
2018-10-02SenateReported as amended
2018-06-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2018-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-19HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-12HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-12HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-12HouseReported as amended
2017-11-20HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1931
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1931&pn=2731
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1931&pn=3664
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1931&pn=4142
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1626
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1695
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1768
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=10/02/2018&RollCallId=1156

Bill Comments

feedback