PA HB1917 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 22 (Detectives and Private Police) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in humane society police officers, further providing for appointment by nonprofit corporations, for qualifications for appointment, for suspension, revocation, limitation and restriction of appointment and restoration of appointment, for training program, for continuing education program, for Statewide registry and for Humane Society Police Officer Advisory Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In humane society police officers, further providing for appointment by nonprofit corporations, for qualifications for appointment, for suspension, revocation, limitation and restriction of appointment and restoration of appointment, for training program, for continuing education program, for Statewide registry and for Humane Society Police Officer Advisory Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1917 PN 2815, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1917 PN 2815, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A05241 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02SenateAct No. 77
2018-10-02SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-09-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-09-25SenateSigned in Senate
2018-09-25SenateSigned in House
2018-09-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-18SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-18SenateLaid on the table
2018-05-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-02-05SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-02-05SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2018-01-26SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2018-01-24SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2018-01-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-01-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-23HouseSecond consideration
2018-01-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-12HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-12HouseReported as amended
2017-11-13HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1917
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1917&pn=2696
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1917&pn=2815
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1143
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1144
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1232
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=673
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=864
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=640

Bill Comments

feedback