PA HB1915 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in contributions by employers and employees, further providing for contributions by employees and for Service and Infrastructure Improvement Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In contributions by employers and employees, further providing for contributions by employees and for Service and Infrastructure Improvement Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1915 PN 2735, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1915 PN 2735, FP (Y: 183 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04766 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-20SenateAct No. 60
2017-12-20SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-13SenateSigned in House
2017-12-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-5)
2017-12-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-12-12SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12SenateSecond consideration
2017-12-11SenateFirst consideration
2017-12-11SenateReported as committed
2017-12-08SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-12-05SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (183-4)
2017-12-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-04HouseSecond consideration
2017-11-27HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-20HouseReported as amended
2017-11-14HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1915
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1915&pn=2706
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1915&pn=2735
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1055
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=879
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1112
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=558
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=589
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=376

Bill Comments

feedback