PA HB1912 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 29, 1953 (P.L.304, No.66), known as the Vital Statistics Law of 1953, in records, further providing for records and fees for copies.
Title
In records, further providing for records and fees for copies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-22 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to HEALTH |