PA HB1910 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) , 44 (Law and Justice) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in selection and retention of judicial officers, further providing for continuing education credit; in other officers, providing for mental health evaluations; and, in employees, further providing for powers and duties of commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In selection and retention of judicial officers, further providing for continuing education credit; in other officers, providing for mental health evaluations; and, in employees, further providing for powers and duties of commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1910 PN 4012, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1910 PN 4012, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1910 PN 3932, 2019 A6327, BRIGGS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06222 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06140 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateSigned in Senate
2020-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-30SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-29SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-24SenateReported as committed
2020-06-24SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2020-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2020-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-15HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-06-15HouseFirst consideration
2020-06-15HouseReported as amended
2019-10-11HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1910
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1910&pn=2658
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1910&pn=3932
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1910&pn=4012
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/15/2020&RollCallId=2229
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/15/2020&RollCallId=2230
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/15/2020&RollCallId=2231
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1433
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=2268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1451
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=1032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=2307
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/30/2020&RollCallId=1050
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=584

Bill Comments

feedback