PA HB1902 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for enforcement; in liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages licenses and regulations, further providing for interlocking business prohibited, for breweries, for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees and for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for enforcement; in liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages licenses and regulations, further providing for interlocking business prohibited, for breweries, for unlawful acts relative to malt or brewed beverages and licensees and for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1902 PN 2786, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1902 PN 2786, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1902 PN 2679, 2017 A5071, A. HARRIS (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1902 PN 2679, 2017 A5071, A. HARRIS, SUSP RULES (Y: 179 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1902 PN 2679, 2017 A4845, A. HARRIS (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1902 PN 2679, 2017 A4844, COX (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1902 PN 2679, 2017 A5053, ELLIS (Y: 185 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-22SenateAct No. 75
2017-12-22SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13SenateSigned in Senate
2017-12-13SenateSigned in House
2017-12-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-12-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-12-12SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12SenateSecond consideration
2017-12-11SenateFirst consideration
2017-12-11SenateReported as committed
2017-12-11SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2017-12-11SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-12-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-06HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-11-27HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-20HouseReported as committed
2017-11-06HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1902
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1902&pn=2679
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1902&pn=2786
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=11/14/2017&RollCallId=1051
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=894
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=895
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=896
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=905
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1135
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=566
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=375

Bill Comments

feedback