PA HB19 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-19)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for definitions, for respiratory therapists, for perfusionist, for genetic counselor and for prosthetists, orthotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters; providing for behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts; and further providing for licenses and certificates and general qualification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for respiratory therapists, for perfusionist, for genetic counselor and for prosthetists, orthotists, pedorthists and orthotic fitters; providing for behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts; and further providing for licenses and certificates and general qualification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 19 PN 2669, FP (Y: 134 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 19 PN 2639, 2021 A3571 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A03446 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-07SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2022-02-07SenateIn the Senate
2022-02-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (134-66)
2022-02-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2022-01-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-01-26HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2022-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2022-01-24HouseLaid on the table
2022-01-24HouseFirst consideration
2022-01-24HouseReported as amended
2021-03-11HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=19
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0019&pn=0846
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0019&pn=2639
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0019&pn=2669
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0019P2669.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=01/24/2022&RollCallId=1240
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=01/24/2022&RollCallId=1241
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=734
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=754
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/07/2022&RollCallId=1302

Bill Comments

feedback