PA HB1898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 22, 1983 (P.L.306, No.84), known as the Board of Vehicles Act, further providing for definitions; providing for vehicle recalls; and further providing for unlawful acts by manufacturers or distributors, for application for license and for licensing cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions; providing for vehicle recalls; and further providing for unlawful acts by manufacturers or distributors, for application for license and for licensing cost.

Sponsors

Rep. James Santora [R]Rep. Thomas Mustio [R]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Gary Day [R]
Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]Rep. Keith Gillespie [R]Rep. Susan Helm [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]
Rep. John Maher [R]Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Marguerite Quinn [R]Rep. Curtis Sonney [R]
Rep. Timothy Briggs [D]Rep. Dominic Costa [D]Rep. Daniel Deasy [D]Rep. Jordan Harris [D]
Rep. William Kortz [D]Rep. Joanna McClinton [D]Rep. Adam Ravenstahl [D]Rep. Alexander Charlton [R]
Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]Rep. John Galloway [D]Rep. Robert Matzie [D]
Rep. Pam Snyder [D]Rep. Rebecca Corbin [R]Rep. Tedd Nesbit [R]Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]
Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Joseph Petrarca [D]Rep. Neal Goodman [D]Rep. Mike Carroll [D]
Rep. Joseph Markosek [D]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. George Dunbar [R]Rep. Michael Peifer [R]
Rep. Dawn Keefer [R]Rep. Patrick Harkins [D]Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]
Rep. John Taylor [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]Rep. James Marshall [R]Rep. Todd Stephens [R]
Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Frank Farry [R]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]
Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. Martina White [R]Rep. Katharine Watson [R]Rep. Ron Marsico [R]
Rep. Michael Reese [R]Rep. Martin Flynn [D]Rep. Kerry Benninghoff [R]Rep. Patty Kim [D]
Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Robert James [R]Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]
Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Michael Sturla [D]Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. Matthew Gabler [R]
Rep. Bryan Barbin [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1898 PN 3784, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1898 PN 3784, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1898 PN 2814, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A05196 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-22HouseSigned in House
2018-06-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (195-0)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-21HouseIn the House
2018-06-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-20SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-12SenateReported as amended
2018-03-16SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2018-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-03-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-12HouseSecond consideration
2018-02-06HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-12HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-12HouseReported as amended
2017-11-08HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1898
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1898&pn=2688
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1898&pn=2814
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1898&pn=3673
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1898&pn=3784
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1141
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1023
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=938
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=998
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=584
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1838
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1428

Bill Comments

feedback