PA HB1896 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to release a use restriction and reversionary interest affecting certain real property situate in the Township of East Vincent, Chester County, to facilitate the grant and conveyance of the real property from the Owen J. Roberts School District to Pennsylvania American Water Company; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Centre County Industrial Development Corporation, certain lands situate in Benner Township, Centre County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of West Chester University of Pennsylvania of the State System of Higher Education and the Governor, to grant and convey to Aqua Pennsylvania, Inc., or its assigns, an existing water tower and permanent utility easement from lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at West Chester University of Pennsylvania situate in the Borough of West Chester, County of Chester, for the purpose of public water distribution.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to release a use restriction and reversionary interest affecting certain real property situate in the Township of East Vincent, Chester County, to facilitate the grant and conveyance of the real property from the Owen J. Roberts School District to Pennsylvania American Water Company; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Centre County Industrial Development Corporation, certain lands situate in Benner Township, Centre County; and authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of West Chester University of Pennsylvania of the State System of Higher Education and the Governor, to grant and convey to Aqua Pennsylvania, Inc., or its assigns, an existing water tower and permanent utility easement from lands of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania at West Chester University of Pennsylvania situate in the Borough of West Chester, County of Chester, for the purpose of public water distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1896 PN 2883, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1896 PN 2883, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1896 PN 2635, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1896 PN 2883, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1896 PN 2883, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1896 PN 2635, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | House | Act No. 104 |
2019-11-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (185-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-11-21 | House | In the House |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-10-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-10-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-29 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-30 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |