PA HB189 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-25 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board; in Pennsylvania liquor stores, further providing for sales by Pennsylvania liquor stores; in licenses and regulations, further providing for shipment of wine into Commonwealth, providing for the Pennsylvania Wine Marketing and Research Program Board, and further providing for unlawful acts relative to liquor, alcohol and liquor licensees; and, in distilleries, wineries, warehouses, bailees and transporters, further providing for limited wineries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board; in Pennsylvania liquor stores, further providing for sales by Pennsylvania liquor stores; in licenses and regulations, further providing for shipment of wine into Commonwealth, providing for the Pennsylvania Wine Marketing and Research Program Board, and further providing for unlawful acts relative to liquor, alcohol and liquor licensees; and, in distilleries, wineries, warehouses, bailees and transporters, further providing for limited wineries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 189 PN 1851, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 189 PN 1851, WILLIAMS MOTION TO TABLE (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 189 PN 1851, A2468, MCILHINNEY MOTION TO TABLE BREWSTER AMENDMENT NO. A-2468 (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Floor: HB 189 PN 181, FP (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-25HouseReferred to RULES
2015-06-24HouseIn the House
2015-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (31-18)
2015-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2015-06-22SenateRe-reported as amended
2015-06-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-06-16SenateFirst consideration
2015-06-16SenateReported as amended
2015-05-20SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2015-05-11SenateIn the Senate
2015-05-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-1)
2015-05-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-05-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-05-06HouseSecond consideration
2015-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2015-04-22HouseLaid on the table
2015-04-22HouseFirst consideration
2015-04-22HouseReported as committed
2015-01-23HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=189
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0189&pn=0181
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0189&pn=1827
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0189&pn=1851
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=06/16/2015&rNbr=265
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2015&rNbr=270
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=309
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/11/2015&rNbr=331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=144
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=145
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=146
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=04/22/2015&rNbr=250
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=04/22/2015&RollCallId=250
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/11/2015&RollCallId=331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=06/16/2015&RollCallId=265
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2015&RollCallId=270

Bill Comments

feedback