PA HB1885 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in personal representative and bond, further providing for requiring or changing amount of bond.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal representative and bond, further providing for requiring or changing amount of bond.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 4255, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1885 PN 4255, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3167, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05914 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 113
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-17HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-16HouseIn the House
2018-10-16SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-15SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-10-15SenateRemoved from table
2018-10-01SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-12SenateReported as committed
2018-04-11SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2018-04-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-09HouseSecond consideration
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-13HouseReported as amended
2017-10-25HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1885
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1885&pn=2640
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1885&pn=3167
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1885&pn=4255
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1301
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/10/2018&RollCallId=1376
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1068
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=934
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=701
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1590
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2100

Bill Comments

feedback