PA HB1885 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in personal representative and bond, further providing for requiring or changing amount of bond.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal representative and bond, further providing for requiring or changing amount of bond.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3167, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A05914 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-04-10SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2018-04-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-09HouseSecond consideration
2018-03-14HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-13HouseReported as amended
2017-10-25HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1885
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1885&pn=2640
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1885&pn=3167
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1301
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/10/2018&RollCallId=1376
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1068

Bill Comments

feedback