PA HB1885 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for liability imposed on and eligibility for public benefits of a municipality of refuge.
Title
Providing for liability imposed on and eligibility for public benefits of a municipality of refuge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1885 PN 4112, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, A10867, ALLOWAY AMENDMENT NO. A-10867 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, FP (Y: 136 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, MOT POSTPONE, CRUZ (Y: 67 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, 2015 A10615, SUSP RULES, STURLA (Y: 61 N: 131 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-09-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08983 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1885 PN 4112, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, A10867, ALLOWAY AMENDMENT NO. A-10867 (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, FP (Y: 136 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, MOT POSTPONE, CRUZ (Y: 67 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1885 PN 3075, 2015 A10615, SUSP RULES, STURLA (Y: 61 N: 131 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-09-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08983 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-14) |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (37-11) |
2016-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (136-55) |
2016-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-20 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |