PA HB1880 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, in licensing of health care facilities, further providing for photo identification tag regulations.
Title
In licensing of health care facilities, further providing for photo identification tag regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1880 PN 2615, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1880 PN 2615, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-11-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-29 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to HEALTH |