PA HB188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for property owner's bill of rights statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for property owner's bill of rights statement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-30 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-18HouseRemoved from table
2020-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-15HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-15HouseLaid on the table
2020-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2020-06-10HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-28HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-03HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-22HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-30HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback