PA HB188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-09 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 188 PN 155, FP (Y: 186 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-09SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-14SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-14SenateReported as committed
2017-03-24SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-03-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (186-11)
2017-03-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-20HouseSecond consideration
2017-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-06HouseReported as committed
2017-01-24HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=188
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0188&pn=0155
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=19
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=95
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=159
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=278

Bill Comments 750

feedback