PA HB1871 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for apportioned registration renewal.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for apportioned registration renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1871 PN 2230, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02507 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1871 PN 2230, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02507 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-10-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-10-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2021-10-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-26 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-09-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |