PA HB187 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-11 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-11 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 30, 1981 (P.L.128, No.43), known as the Agricultural Area Security Law, further providing for definitions and for the purchase of agricultural conservation easements.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for the purchase of agricultural conservation easements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Floor: HB 187 PN 247, FP (Y: 192 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Floor: HB 187 PN 247, FP (Y: 192 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2017-05-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-4) |
2017-05-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-09 | House | Second consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |