PA HB1869 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Maternal Mortality Review Committee and providing for its powers and duties; providing for duties of the Department of Health; and imposing a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Maternal Mortality Review Committee and providing for its powers and duties; providing for duties of the Department of Health; and imposing a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1869 PN 2592, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 2592, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09SenateAct No. 24
2018-05-09SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-05-01SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-04-30SenateSigned in House
2018-04-25SenateSigned in Senate
2018-04-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-04-16SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-03-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-26SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-20SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-20SenateReported as committed
2018-01-02SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-12-11SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-12-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-04HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-04HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-04HouseReported as committed
2017-10-17HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1869
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1869&pn=2592
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=12/04/2017&RollCallId=1087
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=903
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1134
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=03/20/2018&RollCallId=706
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/16/2018&RollCallId=758
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=487

Bill Comments

feedback