PA HB1868 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 35 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 35 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 63 (Professions and Occupations (State Licensed)) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for military and veterans' licensure.
Title
Providing for military and veterans' licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1868 PN 2652, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1868 PN 2652, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: House Bill 1868 PN -1 - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A03525 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1868 PN 2228, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02386 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1868 PN 2652, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: House Bill 1868 PN -1 - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A03525 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1868 PN 2228, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02386 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Act No. 35 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2022-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-29 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-06-28 | House | In the House |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2021-11-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-11-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-25 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-09-15 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |