PA HB1866 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 954 over the North Branch of Plum Creek, South Mahoning Township, Indiana County, as the PFC William T. Bresnock Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 954 over the North Branch of Plum Creek, South Mahoning Township, Indiana County, as the PFC William T. Bresnock Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1866 PN 2571, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-02SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-12-12SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-24HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-18HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-16HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-16HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-16HouseReported as committed
2017-10-16HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback