PA HB1855 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for parole power.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for parole power.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1855 PN 3055, FP (Y: 149 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1855 PN 2921, 2019 A4245, KAUFFMAN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03867 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22SenateRemoved from table
2020-09-22SenateLaid on the table
2020-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-24SenateReported as amended
2019-12-26SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-12-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (149-47)
2019-12-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-12-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-12-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-11-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-19HouseReported as amended
2019-09-23HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1855
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1855&pn=2558
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1855&pn=2921
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1855&pn=3055
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1855&pn=4022
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1386
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1388
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=980
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=999
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/18/2019&RollCallId=1566
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=1025

Bill Comments

feedback