PA HB1851 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.789, No.285), known as The Insurance Department Act of 1921, in examinations, further providing for purpose and for definitions and providing for scheduling conference, for budget estimate and revisions, for billing invoices and for annual examination and analysis report and for the Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association; and making a related repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In examinations, further providing for purpose and for definitions and providing for scheduling conference, for budget estimate and revisions, for billing invoices and for annual examination and analysis report and for the Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association; and making a related repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1851 PN 3797, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1851 PN 3797, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1851 PN 2991, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseAct No. 41
2018-06-22HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-22HouseSigned in House
2018-06-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (195-0)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-21HouseIn the House
2018-06-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-1)
2018-06-21SenateRe-reported as amended
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-20SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-19SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-19SenateReported as committed
2018-04-11SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2018-04-09SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2018-04-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-03-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-14HouseSecond consideration
2018-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2018-02-05HouseLaid on the table
2018-02-05HouseFirst consideration
2018-02-05HouseReported as amended
2017-10-10HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1851
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1851&pn=2552
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1851&pn=2991
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1851&pn=3797
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=02/05/2018&RollCallId=1243
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=02/05/2018&RollCallId=1242
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/09/2018&RollCallId=1365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=990
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1037
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1427
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1836

Bill Comments

feedback