PA HB1851 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.789, No.285), known as The Insurance Department Act of 1921, in examinations, further providing for purpose and for definitions and providing for scheduling conference, for budget estimate and revisions, for billing invoices and for annual examination and analysis report and for the Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association; and making a related repeal.
Title
In examinations, further providing for purpose and for definitions and providing for scheduling conference, for budget estimate and revisions, for billing invoices and for annual examination and analysis report and for the Pennsylvania Professional Liability Joint Underwriting Association; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1851 PN 3797, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1851 PN 3797, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1851 PN 2991, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1851 PN 3797, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1851 PN 3797, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1851 PN 2991, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | House | Act No. 41 |
2018-06-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-21 | House | In the House |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-1) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2018-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-14 | House | Second consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2018-02-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-05 | House | First consideration |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |