PA HB1850 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in auditors and accountants, further providing for appointment of accountant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In auditors and accountants, further providing for appointment of accountant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1850 PN 2318, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-12SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2024-07-09SenateIn the Senate
2024-07-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2024-07-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-07-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-07-08HouseSecond consideration
2024-07-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-06-26HouseRe-committed to RULES
2024-06-26HouseFirst consideration
2024-06-26HouseReported as committed
2023-11-15HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1850
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1850&pn=2318
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1850P2318.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/26/2024&RollCallId=2163
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=67&theDate=07/08/2024&RollCallId=2269
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1417
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=07/09/2024&RollCallId=2287

Bill Comments

feedback