PA HB185 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-19)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 185 PN 177, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26SenateFirst consideration
2016-09-26SenateReported as committed
2015-06-18SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2015-06-15SenateIn the Senate
2015-06-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2015-06-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-06-10HouseSecond consideration
2015-06-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-02HouseRe-committed to RULES
2015-06-02HouseFirst consideration
2015-06-02HouseReported as committed
2015-01-23HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=185
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0185&pn=0177
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/02/2015&rNbr=409
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/10/2015&rNbr=561
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=420
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/15/2015&rNbr=497
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/02/2015&RollCallId=409
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/10/2015&RollCallId=561
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/15/2015&RollCallId=497
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=09/26/2016&RollCallId=1013

Bill Comments 750

feedback